Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 10/03/1984
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Hightower, Jack E. [D-TX-13]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38]* 10/03/1984
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 10/09/1984
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/09/1984
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/09/1984
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/09/1984
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/09/1984
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/09/1984
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/09/1984
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 10/09/1984
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/09/1984
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/09/1984
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 10/09/1984
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/09/1984
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/09/1984
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 10/10/1984
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 10/10/1984
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/10/1984
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/10/1984
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 10/10/1984
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/10/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/10/1984
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/10/1984
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 10/10/1984
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 10/10/1984
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 10/11/1984
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/11/1984
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/11/1984
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 10/11/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 10/11/1984
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-17] 10/11/1984
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/11/1984
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 10/12/1984
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 10/12/1984
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/12/1984
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/12/1984