Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Perkins, Carl Dewey [D-KY-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/27/1983
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 01/27/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Burton, Phillip [D-CA-5]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/27/1983
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/02/1983
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 02/02/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 02/02/1983
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 02/02/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 02/02/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 02/02/1983
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 02/02/1983
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 02/02/1983
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 02/02/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/02/1983
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/02/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/02/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 02/02/1983
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 02/02/1983
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23] 02/02/1983
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 02/02/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 02/02/1983
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/02/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/02/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 02/02/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/02/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 02/02/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/02/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/17/1983
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 02/17/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/17/1983
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/17/1983
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 02/17/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/17/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/17/1983
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 02/17/1983
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 02/17/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/17/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/17/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 02/17/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 02/17/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 02/17/1983
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/17/1983
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 02/17/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/17/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/17/1983
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/17/1983
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 02/17/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/17/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/17/1983
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/17/1983
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 02/17/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/02/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 03/02/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/02/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 03/02/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/02/1983
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/02/1983
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/02/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 03/02/1983
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/02/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 03/02/1983
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 03/02/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/02/1983
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/02/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 03/02/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 03/02/1983
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/09/1983
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/09/1983
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/09/1983
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 03/09/1983
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/09/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/09/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/24/1983
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 03/24/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/24/1983
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/24/1983
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/24/1983
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/24/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/24/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 03/24/1983
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 03/24/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/24/1983
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/24/1983
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 03/24/1983
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/24/1983
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/24/1983
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 03/24/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/24/1983
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/13/1983
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/13/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 04/13/1983
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 04/13/1983
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/13/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/13/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/10/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/10/1983
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 05/10/1983
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 05/10/1983
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 05/10/1983
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 05/19/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/19/1983
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/19/1983
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/19/1983
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 05/26/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 06/08/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 06/14/1983
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 06/14/1983

Show cosponsors who withdrew