Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/07/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/07/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 02/07/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/07/1983
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/07/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 03/03/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 03/03/1983
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 03/03/1983
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 03/03/1983
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/09/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 03/14/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 03/16/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/16/1983
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/22/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/22/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/22/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/22/1983
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/22/1983
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 03/23/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/23/1983
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 03/23/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/24/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/24/1983