Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Burton, Phillip [D-CA-5]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-13]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/22/1983
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/22/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 02/22/1983
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 03/16/1983
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/16/1983
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 03/16/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/16/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/16/1983
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 03/16/1983
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 03/16/1983
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-19] 03/16/1983
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 03/16/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/16/1983
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/16/1983
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 03/16/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/16/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 03/16/1983
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/16/1983
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/16/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/16/1983
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/16/1983
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/16/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 03/16/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/16/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/16/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/16/1983
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/16/1983
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 03/16/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/16/1983
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 03/16/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/16/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/16/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/16/1983
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/16/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 03/16/1983
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 03/16/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 03/16/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/16/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/16/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/16/1983
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 03/16/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/16/1983
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 03/16/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/16/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 03/16/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 03/16/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/16/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/16/1983
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/16/1983
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 03/16/1983
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/16/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/16/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/16/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/21/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 03/21/1983
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 03/21/1983
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/21/1983
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/24/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/24/1983
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/24/1983
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 03/24/1983
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/19/1983
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 04/19/1983
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 04/19/1983
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/19/1983
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 04/19/1983
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6] 04/20/1983
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/20/1983
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 04/20/1983
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/20/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/20/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/20/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 05/04/1983
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 05/04/1983
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/04/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/04/1983
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/04/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/04/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/04/1983
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/04/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/04/1983
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/04/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/04/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/1983
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 05/04/1983
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/04/1983
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4] 05/04/1983
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 05/04/1983
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/04/1983
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/04/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/04/1983
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 05/04/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 05/04/1983
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/04/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/10/1983
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 05/10/1983
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/10/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/10/1983
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/10/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/10/1983
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/10/1983
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/10/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/17/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/17/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 05/17/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/24/1983
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 05/24/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/24/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/24/1983
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 05/24/1983
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/24/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/24/1983
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 05/24/1983
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 05/24/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/24/1983
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/24/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/24/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/02/1983
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 06/02/1983
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/02/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/02/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/02/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/02/1983
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/02/1983
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 06/08/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 06/08/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 06/08/1983
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/08/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/08/1983
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/08/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 07/20/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 07/20/1983
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 07/20/1983