Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 01/26/1984
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 02/22/1984
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 02/22/1984
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/22/1984
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/22/1984
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/22/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/22/1984
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 02/22/1984
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 02/22/1984
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/22/1984
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/22/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/22/1984
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/22/1984
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/22/1984
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/22/1984
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 02/22/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/22/1984
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/22/1984
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/22/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 02/22/1984
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 02/22/1984
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/22/1984
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 02/22/1984
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 02/22/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/22/1984
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 02/22/1984
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/22/1984
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/22/1984
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/22/1984
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 02/22/1984
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/22/1984
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 02/22/1984
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/22/1984
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 02/22/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/29/1984
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 02/29/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/29/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/29/1984
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 02/29/1984
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/29/1984
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/29/1984
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 02/29/1984
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 02/29/1984
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 02/29/1984
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 02/29/1984
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/29/1984
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/29/1984
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 02/29/1984
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 02/29/1984
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/29/1984
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/29/1984
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/29/1984
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 02/29/1984
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/29/1984
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 02/29/1984
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/29/1984
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/29/1984
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/29/1984
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 02/29/1984
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/29/1984
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 02/29/1984
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/29/1984
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/29/1984
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/29/1984
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 02/29/1984
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 02/29/1984
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/29/1984
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/13/1984
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/13/1984
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/13/1984
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/13/1984
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/13/1984
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 03/13/1984
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/13/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/13/1984
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 03/13/1984
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/13/1984
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 03/13/1984
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 03/13/1984
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 03/13/1984
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/13/1984
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 03/13/1984
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/13/1984
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/1984
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/13/1984
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/13/1984
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 03/13/1984
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/13/1984
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 03/13/1984
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/13/1984
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/22/1984
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 03/22/1984
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 03/22/1984
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/22/1984
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/22/1984
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/22/1984
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/22/1984
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 03/22/1984
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/22/1984
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/22/1984
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/22/1984
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 03/22/1984
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 03/22/1984
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 03/27/1984
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/27/1984
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/27/1984
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 03/27/1984
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/27/1984
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/1984
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 03/27/1984
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/27/1984
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 03/27/1984
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/10/1984
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 04/10/1984
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 04/10/1984
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/10/1984
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/10/1984
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/10/1984
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/10/1984
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/10/1984
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 04/10/1984
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/10/1984
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/10/1984
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/10/1984
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/10/1984
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/10/1984
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/10/1984
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/10/1984
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 04/10/1984
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/10/1984
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 04/10/1984
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 04/10/1984
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 04/10/1984
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/10/1984
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 04/10/1984
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/10/1984
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 04/24/1984
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/24/1984
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 04/24/1984
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/24/1984
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/24/1984
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/24/1984
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/24/1984
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 04/24/1984
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/24/1984
Rep. Britt, Robin [D-NC-6] 04/24/1984
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/24/1984
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/24/1984
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/24/1984
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/1984
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/24/1984
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/24/1984
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 04/24/1984
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 04/24/1984
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/24/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/24/1984
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/01/1984
Rep. Perkins, Carl Dewey [D-KY-7] 05/01/1984
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 05/01/1984
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/01/1984
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/01/1984
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 05/01/1984
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/01/1984
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/01/1984
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/09/1984
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 05/09/1984
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 05/09/1984