Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A joint resolution designating February 16, 1985, as "Lithuanian Independence Day".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/19/1984Became Public Law No: 98-539.
10/19/1984Signed by President.
10/11/1984Presented to President.
10/05/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/05/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
10/05/1984House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1984Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
10/19/1984Became Public Law No: 98-539.
10/19/1984Signed by President.
10/11/1984HousePresented to President.
10/10/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/05/1984SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/05/1984HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/05/1984HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/1984HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
10/03/1984HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 10/04/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 10/04/1984
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 10/04/1984
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 10/04/1984
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20]* 10/04/1984

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service10/03/1984 Referred to
10/05/1984 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.655.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.655. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/03/1984)

Directs the President to designate February 16, 1985, as Lithuanian Independence Day.