Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 01/24/1984
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/24/1984
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 02/09/1984
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 02/09/1984
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 02/09/1984
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 02/09/1984
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/09/1984
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 02/09/1984
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 02/09/1984
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/09/1984
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/09/1984
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/09/1984
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/09/1984
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 02/09/1984
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/09/1984
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 02/09/1984
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/09/1984
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/09/1984
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 02/28/1984
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/28/1984
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/28/1984
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 02/28/1984
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 02/28/1984
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/28/1984
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/28/1984
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/28/1984
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 02/28/1984
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/28/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 03/14/1984
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/14/1984
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 05/03/1984
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/03/1984
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/09/1984
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/21/1984