Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baker, Howard H., Jr. [R-TN]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/19/1983
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/19/1983
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/26/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/26/1983
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/26/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/12/1983
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 05/12/1983
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 05/16/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/09/1983
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 06/09/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 06/21/1983
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 06/27/1983
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/27/1983
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 06/28/1983
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/18/1983
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 07/21/1983
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/21/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/25/1983
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 11/09/1983