Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/17/1983
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Tower, John G. [R-TX]* 05/17/1983
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 05/24/1983
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 05/24/1983
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/13/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/21/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/21/1983
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/23/1983
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 09/15/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/29/1983
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 10/18/1983
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 03/05/1984
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/13/1984
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/19/1984
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/20/1984
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/27/1984
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/27/1984
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 05/09/1984
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/26/1984