Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 08/03/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 08/04/1983
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 08/04/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/27/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/27/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/27/1983
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 01/30/1984
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 01/30/1984
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/30/1984
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 02/06/1984
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 02/06/1984
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 02/09/1984
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/27/1984
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/27/1984
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/02/1984