Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to provide continuing authority to the Secretary of Agriculture for recovering costs associated with cotton classing services to producers and to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to invest funds derived from fees for certain voluntary grading and inspection services.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend section 3a of the Cotton Statistics and Estimates Act to provide continuing authority to the Secretary of Agriculture for recovering costs associated with cotton classing services to producers.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/28/1984Became Public Law No: 98-403.
08/28/1984Signed by President.
08/17/1984Presented to President.
08/10/1984Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments. By Voice Vote.
05/21/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/02/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
04/12/1984Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 98-395.
11/11/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
08/28/1984Became Public Law No: 98-403.
08/28/1984Signed by President.
08/17/1984SenatePresented to President.
08/15/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
08/10/1984SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments. By Voice Vote.
05/21/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/21/1984HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
05/02/1984SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
04/12/1984SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 775.
04/12/1984SenateCommittee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 98-395.
03/28/1984SenateCommittee on Agriculture. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/08/1984SenateSubcommittee on Agricultural Production. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-665.
Action By: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry Subcommittee on Agricultural Production, Marketing, and Stabilization of Prices
01/30/1984SenateCommittee on Agriculture received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Favorable.
11/11/1983SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry11/11/1983 Referred to
03/28/1984 Markup by
04/12/1984 Reported by S.Rept 98-395
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry Subcommittee on Agricultural Production, Marketing, and Stabilization of Prices02/08/1984 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.2085.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2085. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/21/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Amends the Cotton Statistics and Estimates Act to extend the Secretary of Agriculture's authority to recover cotton classing costs through FY 1988.

Provides for the collection of classification fees from participating producers or producer-agents. Sets specified fee ceilings based on annual inflation rate increases. Prohibits fee increases if accumulated reserves exceed 20 percent of the previous year's classification costs.

Provides that all submitted cotton samples shall become the property of the United States and shall be sold (exempts such samples from the Federal Property and Administrative Services Act).

Makes such fees and sale proceeds available without fiscal year limitation.

Authorizes the Secretary to invest such fees and sale proceeds in interest-bearing accounts or U.S. debt instruments.

Authorizes appropriations to the extent that such fees and proceeds do not fully cover costs.

Authorizes the Secretary to invest operating balances from inspection and grading services provided under the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 in interest-bearing accounts or U.S. debt instruments. Makes such interest or late payment penalties available without fiscal year limitation.