Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]* 11/17/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 11/17/1983
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/02/1984
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/02/1984
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 03/26/1984
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/05/1984
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 04/11/1984
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 04/25/1984
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/02/1984

Show cosponsors who withdrew