Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 01/27/1983
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/27/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA] 01/31/1983
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 02/01/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/02/1983
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 02/15/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/15/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/15/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/15/1983
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/15/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 02/15/1983
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/15/1983
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 02/23/1983
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 02/23/1983
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/28/1983
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/01/1983
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/09/1983
Sen. Tower, John G. [R-TX] 03/09/1983
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/09/1983
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/09/1983
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 03/21/1983
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 04/05/1983
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 05/02/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 06/10/1983