Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the transfer to the Smithsonian Institution without reimbursement of the General Post Office Building and the site thereof located in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/1984Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/08/1984Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
09/26/1984Committee on Rules. Ordered favorably reported H.R. 4025 in lieu of this measure.
08/09/1984Committees on Rules. Joint hearings held with the Committee on House Administration.
03/27/1984Referred jointly to the Committees on Environment and Public Works; Rules by unanimous consent.
Action By: Senate
03/27/1984Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
02/09/1984Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate
02/08/1984Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 02/08/1984
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/08/1984

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs02/08/1984 Referred to
03/27/1984 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works03/27/1984 Referred to
Senate Rules and Administration03/27/1984 Referred to
08/09/1984 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2271. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/08/1984)

Authorizes the Administrator of General Services to transfer the General Post Office Building in the District of Columbia to the Smithsonian Institution without reimbursement.

Directs the Administrator to relocate all operations of the United States International Trade Commission and the United States Postal Service currently located in such building.

Directs the Administrator and the Chairman of the Commission to each report separately in writing on the status of such relocation to the Committees on Environment and Public Works, Finance, and Rules and Administration of the Senate and to the Committees on Public Works and Transportation and Ways and Means of the House of Representatives.

Authorizes appropriations to the Smithsonian Board of Regents for fiscal years beginning with FY 1985 for renovation and repair of the General Post Office Building.