Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize and direct the Librarian of Congress, subject to the supervision and authority of a Federal, civilian, or military agency, to proceed with the construction of the Library of Congress Mass Book Deacidification Facility, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
09/28/1984Became Public Law No: 98-427.
09/28/1984Signed by President.
09/20/1984Presented to President.
09/17/1984Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
09/11/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/11/1984House Committee on Public Works and Transportation Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/18/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
05/08/1984Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias with an amendment. With written report No. 98-429.
03/13/1984Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/28/1984Became Public Law No: 98-427.
09/28/1984Signed by President.
09/20/1984SenatePresented to President.
09/19/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/17/1984SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
09/11/1984HouseHouse Incorporated H.R.5607 in This Measure as an Amendment.
09/11/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/11/1984HouseHouse Committee on Public Works and Transportation Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/04/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
05/21/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
05/18/1984SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
05/18/1984SenateConsidered by Senate.
05/18/1984SenateS.Amdt.3081 Amendment SP 3081 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
05/18/1984SenateS.Amdt.3081 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator Mathias. Technical amendment.
05/08/1984SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 845.
05/08/1984SenateCommittee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias with an amendment. With written report No. 98-429.
05/01/1984SenateCommittee on Rules. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/11/1984SenateCommittee on Rules. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-1134.
03/13/1984SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 03/13/1984
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 03/13/1984
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/13/1984
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/13/1984
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/11/1984
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/13/1984

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration03/13/1984 Referred to
04/11/1984 Hearings by
05/01/1984 Markup by
05/08/1984 Reported by S.Rept 98-429
House Public Works and Transportation05/21/1984 Referred to
09/11/1984 Discharged from
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds06/04/1984 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2418. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/11/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 5607)

Directs the Librarian of Congress, subject to the supervision and construction authority of a Federal civilian or military agency, to construct the Library of Congress Mass Deacidification Facility. Directs the Librarian to equip, furnish, operate and maintain such facility.

Authorizes appropriations.