Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/02/1983
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 02/02/1983
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 02/03/1983
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 02/03/1983
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/03/1983
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/08/1983
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/14/1983