Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to recognize the organization known as the Women's Army Corps Veterans' Association.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/02/1984Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/1984Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
10/02/1984Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1304.
Action By: Senate
10/02/1984Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
05/24/1984Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/29/1984
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/29/1984
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 06/29/1984
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/29/1984
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 06/29/1984
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 06/29/1984
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/30/1984
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/30/1984
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 07/30/1984
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/30/1984
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/30/1984
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 08/07/1984
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 08/07/1984
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 08/07/1984
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 08/07/1984
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 08/07/1984
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 08/10/1984
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 08/10/1984
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 08/10/1984
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 08/10/1984
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/20/1984
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 09/20/1984
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/20/1984
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 09/20/1984
Sen. Tower, John G. [R-TX] 09/20/1984
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/25/1984
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 09/25/1984
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 09/25/1984
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/25/1984
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 09/25/1984
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 09/25/1984
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/25/1984
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 09/25/1984
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ] 09/26/1984
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/26/1984
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/26/1984
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/26/1984
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 09/26/1984
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/26/1984
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/26/1984
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/26/1984
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 09/26/1984
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV] 09/27/1984
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/27/1984
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/27/1984
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/27/1984
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 10/02/1984
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/03/1984
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/03/1984
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/09/1984
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/09/1984

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/24/1984 Referred to
10/02/1984 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2720. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/24/1984)

Grants a Federal charter to the Women's Army Corps Veterans' Association.