Committees: S.373 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Governmental Affairs02/01/1983 Referred to
03/17/1983 Markup by
06/21/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-159
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Civil Service, Post Office, and General Services02/15/1983 Referred to
03/17/1983 Markup by
03/17/1983 Reported by
House Science and Technology06/29/1983 Referred to
11/10/1983 Markup by
01/31/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-593 Part 1
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Science, Research and Technology07/12/1983 Referred to
10/28/1983 Markup by
10/28/1983 Reported by
House Armed Services01/31/1984 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Seapower and Strategic and Critical Materials03/02/1984 Referred to
03/08/1984 Markup by
03/08/1984 Reported by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries01/31/1984 Referred to
03/14/1984 Markup by
03/16/1984 Reported by H.Rept 98-593 Part 2