Committees: S.461 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Governmental Affairs02/03/1983 Referred to
03/17/1983 Markup by
03/24/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-59
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management02/15/1983 Referred to
02/24/1983 Hearings by
03/10/1983 Markup by
03/10/1983 Reported by
House Judiciary04/11/1983 Referred to
09/19/1983 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations04/13/1983 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service04/11/1983 Referred to
09/19/1983 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Human Resources04/12/1983 Referred to