Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 02/22/1983
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/22/1983
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 02/24/1983
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/24/1983
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/24/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 02/24/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 02/24/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/24/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/18/1983
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/24/1983
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/24/1983
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/07/1983
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 04/07/1983
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/07/1983
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 04/14/1983
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/14/1983
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 04/14/1983
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/14/1983
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 04/15/1983
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 04/15/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/27/1983
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/27/1983
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 06/09/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/13/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/28/1983
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 09/12/1983
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/15/1983
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/14/1984