Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

High Technology Morrill Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a national technology education grants program to provide matching Federal assistance to joint initiatives by private industry, educational institutions, and State government to strengthen science, engineering, and technical education, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/01/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/07/1983Committee on Labor and Human Resources requested executive comment from Treasury Department, Defense Department, Commerce Department, Labor Department, Education Department, GAO, OMB.
03/07/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Education.
Action By: Committee on Labor and Human Resources
03/01/1983Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 03/01/1983
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO]* 03/01/1983
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/01/1983
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV]* 03/01/1983
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/02/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/10/1983

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Labor and Human Resources03/01/1983 Referred to
Senate Labor and Human Resources Subcommittee on Education, Arts, and Humanities03/07/1983 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.631.


Subjects (77)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.631. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/01/1983)

High Technology Morrill Act - Establishes the Technology Education Trust Fund in the Treasury. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to be the trustee of the Fund and to report to the Congress annually on the Fund's operation. Directs the Secretary to transfer from the Treasury's general fund to the Fund, for FY 1984 through 1988, three percent of the rents, royalties, and other sums paid to the United States under the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act, the Mineral Leasing Act of 1920, and any other Federal statute authorizing payments for mineral resource development designated by the Secretary for the purpose of this Act. Limits the amount of such transfers to $500,000,000 in any one fiscal year. Provides that amounts in the Fund shall be available for making payments in accordance with this Act as provided in advance by appropriation Acts, and without fiscal year limitation on availability unless specifically enacted. Prohibits the Secretary from making transfers to the Fund after September 30, 1988. Directs the Secretary to pay into the Treasury's general fund any amounts remaining in the Fund after September 30, 1990.

Authorizes the Director of the National Science Foundation to make grants to education institutions, private for-profit business concerns, and State agencies making application jointly to pay the Federal share of the cost of technology education programs. Allows private nonprofit organizations and State agencies to submit applications jointly if the nonprofit private organization represents an educational institution and a for-profit business concern, or a group of such institutions and concerns.

Requires that such applications be consistent with State economic development and educational policies and with private sector priorities and educational institution needs. Requires that State and local public sources pay 30 percent, and for-profit businesses pay 20 percent, of total program costs. Sets forth other application requirements.

Allows grants made under this Act to be used for: (1) laboratory equipment and facilities in educational institutions; (2) improving science and mathematics education and computer literacy in elementary and secondary schools through teacher training, equipment improvement, and curricula development; (3) research/education centers for training new scientific, engineering, and technical employees while carrying out applied research or stimulating innovation, technology transfer, and the application of new technologies; (4) mathematics, science, and engineering faculty development through support for graduate students who enter teaching, faculty exchange with industry, teaching retraining, and other faculty retention programs; (5) lifelong learning and cooperative education activities for the scientific, engineering, and technical work force; (6) development of new educational methods and equipment such as computer based educational aids and telecommunication instructional technologies; (7) research and training in the management of technological innovation; (8) improving the access of women, minorities, and handicapped to technical, engineering, and scientific fields; and (9) cooperative programs between the humanities and the sciences.

Sets forth provisions for grant payments, distribution of funds, withholding, administration, and audit.

Authorizes the Director to establish advisory committees for purposes of this Act.

Directs the Director to consult with the Secretary of Defense to coordinate technical training programs supported by the Department of Defense and activities assisted under this Act. Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to transfer Department of Defense funds for technical training programs to the Director to carry out programs under this Act.

Directs the Director to consult with the Secretaries of Commerce, Labor, Education, and the heads of other appropriate Federal agencies in carrying out this Act.

Directs the Director to report annually to the Congress on activities assisted by this Act.