Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine Act of 1983

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine Act of 1983

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine Act of 1983

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to amend title 10, United States Code, to establish a Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend chapter 104, title 10, United States Code, to establish the Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
05/27/1983Became Public Law No: 98-36.
05/27/1983Signed by President.
05/17/1983Presented to President.
05/12/1983Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments. By Voice Vote.
05/09/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 295 - 0 (Record Vote No: 93).
05/09/1983House Committee on Armed Services Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
03/31/1983Committee on Armed Services filed written report. Report No. 98-39.
03/23/1983Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
03/22/1983Committee on Armed Services. Reported to Senate by Senator Tower with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
03/02/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
05/27/1983Became Public Law No: 98-36.
05/27/1983Signed by President.
05/17/1983SenatePresented to President.
05/17/1983SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
05/12/1983SenateSenate agreed to House amendments. By Voice Vote.
05/09/1983HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 295 - 0 (Record Vote No: 93).
05/09/1983HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/09/1983HouseHouse Committee on Armed Services Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
04/07/1983HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/07/1983HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
04/05/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
03/31/1983SenateCommittee on Armed Services filed written report. Report No. 98-39.
03/23/1983SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
03/22/1983SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 64.
03/22/1983SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Reported to Senate by Senator Tower with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
03/22/1983SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/15/1983SenateSubcommittee on Manpower and Personnel (Arm Serv). Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Senate Armed Services Subcommittee on Manpower and Personnel
03/02/1983SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tower, John G. [R-TX]* 03/02/1983
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/22/1983
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 03/22/1983
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/22/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/22/1983
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/22/1983

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services03/02/1983 Referred to
03/22/1983 Markup by
03/22/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-39
Senate Armed Services Subcommittee on Manpower and Personnel03/15/1983 Markup by
03/15/1983 Reported by
House Armed Services04/05/1983 Referred to
05/09/1983 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation04/07/1983 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.653.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.653. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/09/1983)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #93 (295-0))

Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine Act of 1983 - Authorizes the establishment of the Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, a nonprofit corporation, to: (1) carry out medical research and education projects under cooperative arrangements with the Uniformed Services University of Health Science (University); (2) serve as a focus for the interchange between military and civilian medical personnel; and (3) encourage the participation of medical, dental, nursing, veterinary, and other biomedical sciences in the work of the Foundation for the mutual benefit of military and civilian medicine.

States that the Foundation shall not for any purpose be an agency or instrumentality of the U.S. Government.

Directs the Council of Directors of the Foundation to report to the President annually on the operations of the Foundation.

Authorizes the Board of Regents of the University to contract with the Foundation for cooperative enterprises in medical research, consultation and education subject to specified restrictions. Requires the Board to notify the Armed Services Committees at least 15 days before it enters into agreements for certain facilities or services. Prohibits the Board from contracting with the Foundation if the contract would obligate the University to make outlays before enactment of appropriate budget authority.

Deems any Foundation scholar or other person providing volunteer services to the University a Federal employee for purposes of workers' compensation or tort claims.