Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 03/17/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/22/1983
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/20/1983
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 05/04/1983
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/19/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/21/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 01/23/1984