Committees: S.930 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration03/24/1983 Referred to
04/20/1983 Hearings by
05/12/1983 Markup by
05/16/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-97
House Administration05/26/1983 Referred to
07/26/1983 Markup by
07/28/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-330