Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Comprehensive Forfeiture Act of 1984

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Comprehensive Forfeiture Act of 1983

Short Titles as Introduced

Comprehensive Forfeiture Act of 1983

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reform Federal criminal and civil forfeiture.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
02/03/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
09/14/1983Committee on Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 98-224.
08/04/1983Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/24/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/12/1984HouseSee H.J.Res.648.
02/14/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/14/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/09/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/07/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
02/07/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
02/07/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/03/1984SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
02/03/1984SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
02/03/1984SenateS.Amdt.2696 Amendment SP 2696 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
02/03/1984SenateS.Amdt.2696 Proposed by Senator Biden. To provide for the investment and use of illegal drug profits.
09/14/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 98-224.
08/04/1983SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 350.
08/04/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/26/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/15/1983SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/24/1983SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary03/24/1983 Referred to
07/26/1983 Markup by
08/04/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-224
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Law04/15/1983 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/07/1984 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/09/1984 Referred to
House Judiciary02/07/1984 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime02/14/1984 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/07/1984 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade02/14/1984 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.948. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (02/03/1984)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Comprehensive Forfeiture Act of 1984 - Amends the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Statute (RICO) to specify that property subject to forfeiture for racketeering activity includes: (1) all proceeds obtained directly or indirectly from racketeering activity; and (2) real and tangible and intangible personal property.

Makes property forfeitable to the United States upon the commission of the act giving rise to forfeiture. Permits the forfeiture of property which has been transferred to a third party, but includes a provision protecting innocent bona fide purchasers.

Authorizes a court to order the forfeiture of substitute assets of the defendant where the original property cannot be located or traced.

Authorizes a court to take appropriate action preserving the availability of property during the pre-indictment period effective for up to 90 days. Specifies the circumstances under which a temporary restraining order may be entered without notice to the affected party.

Authorizes the Attorney General to grant petitions for remission or mitigation of forfeiture. Allows the Attorney General to establish regulations governing the restitution and disposition of forfeited property.

Amends the Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention and Control Act of 1970 to establish general criminal forfeiture provisions for felony violations under titles II and III. Includes provisions similar to the RICO amendments of this Act, relating to property subject to forfeiture, third party transfers, asset substitution, pre-indictment orders, and disposition of property.

Creates a rebuttable presumption of forfeitability of certain property.

Authorizes a court to issue a warrant authorizing the seizure of property subject to forfeiture in the same manner provided for a search warrant, if other injunctive relief would not assure the availability of the property.

Provides that a criminal forfeiture proceeding shall stay any civil forfeiture proceeding with respect to the same property.

Sets forth procedures for an ancillary hearing to resolve third party claims. Makes it unlawful to invest the income of a felony drug violation. Permits the forfeiture action to be brought in the district in which the defendant is found or is being prosecuted.

Amends the Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention and Control Act of 1970 to allow the Attorney General to transfer drug-related forfeited property to other Federal, State or local agencies.

Establishes within the United States Treasury the Department of Justice Assets Forfeiture Fund to pay for maintenance of forfeited property, awards to informants, and valid liens and mortgages against such property.

Amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to provide for the seizure of vessels, vehicles, merchandise or baggage valued at $100,000 or less. Requires written notice of such seizure to all interested parties. Increases the surety bond for any person claiming interest in the seized property to $5,000, or ten percent of the value of the claimed property, whichever is less.

Establishes in the Treasury the Customs Forfeiture Fund to pay for maintenance of forfeited property and awards to informants.

Requires the deposit in such Fund of all proceeds from the sale and disposition of property forfeited under custom law.

Allows for the retention of forfeited property for official use or for transfer to other Federal, State or local governmental agencies assisting in related Federal law enforcement.

Increases from $50,000 to $150,000 the award of compensation given to informers for information leading to forfeiture.

Grants customs officers arrest authority and the right to carry firearms.

Repeals provisions of the Internal Revenue Code dealing with customs officers' law enforcement authority to conform to this Act.

Provides that seizures of property effected by customs officers shall be governed by this Act.