Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/24/1983
Sen. Baker, Howard H., Jr. [R-TN]* 03/24/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 03/24/1983
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 03/24/1983
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/24/1983
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 05/02/1983
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/02/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/02/1983
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 05/02/1983
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 05/02/1983
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 05/02/1983
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/02/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 05/02/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 06/08/1983
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/03/1983
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/26/1983