Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA]* 01/27/1983
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 01/31/1983
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/03/1983
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/03/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 02/03/1983
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/03/1983
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/03/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/03/1983
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/03/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/03/1983
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 02/03/1983
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 02/03/1983
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 02/03/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/03/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 02/15/1983
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/15/1983
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 02/15/1983
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 02/15/1983
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/15/1983
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/15/1983
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 02/15/1983
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/22/1983
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/22/1983
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 02/22/1983
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/22/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/22/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/22/1983
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/22/1983
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/22/1983
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/22/1983
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 02/22/1983
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/22/1983
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/22/1983
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/01/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/01/1983
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/01/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/01/1983
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/01/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/07/1983
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 03/07/1983
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 03/11/1983
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/11/1983
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA] 03/11/1983
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/11/1983
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/11/1983
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/05/1983
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/05/1983
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/05/1983
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/14/1983
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/07/1983