Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/18/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 05/18/1983
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 06/16/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 06/16/1983
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/16/1983
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 06/16/1983
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/16/1983
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/16/1983
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/16/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/16/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/16/1983
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/16/1983
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 06/16/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/23/1983
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 06/23/1983
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/23/1983
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/23/1983
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/23/1983
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/29/1983
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/29/1983
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/29/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/29/1983
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 07/13/1983
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/16/1983
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 09/21/1983
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 09/29/1983
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/06/1983
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/18/1983