Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the day of October 22, 1983, as "Metropolitan Opera Day."


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/14/1983Became Public Law No: 98-130.
10/14/1983Signed by President.
10/06/1983Presented to President.
10/04/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
10/04/1983House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/1983Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
09/15/1983Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
07/13/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/14/1983Became Public Law No: 98-130.
10/14/1983Signed by President.
10/06/1983SenatePresented to President.
10/06/1983SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/04/1983HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/04/1983HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/1983HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/21/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
09/20/1983SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
09/15/1983SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
09/15/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
09/15/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/13/1983SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (33)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary07/13/1983 Referred to
09/15/1983 Markup by
09/15/1983 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service09/21/1983 Referred to
10/04/1983 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.128. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/13/1983)

Designates October 22, 1983 as Metropolitan Opera Day.