Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 02/09/1984
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/21/1984
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/21/1984
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/21/1984
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 02/21/1984
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/21/1984
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/12/1984
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/12/1984
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 03/12/1984
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/12/1984
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/12/1984
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/12/1984
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 03/12/1984
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 03/12/1984
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/12/1984
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/12/1984
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/12/1984
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/12/1984
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/12/1984
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 03/12/1984
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/12/1984
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 03/12/1984
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/14/1984
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/14/1984
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/14/1984
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/14/1984
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 03/14/1984
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/14/1984
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 03/14/1984
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/21/1984
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/21/1984
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 03/21/1984
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/29/1984
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 03/29/1984
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/29/1984
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/29/1984
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/29/1984
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/29/1984
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/29/1984
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/25/1984
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/25/1984