Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to authorize and request the President to designate the month of May, 1984, as "National Physical Fitness and Sports Month".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
05/15/1984Became Public Law No: 98-283.
05/15/1984Signed by President.
05/03/1984Presented to President.
05/01/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/1984House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/27/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/23/1984Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
02/09/1984Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
05/15/1984Became Public Law No: 98-283.
05/15/1984Signed by President.
05/03/1984SenatePresented to President.
05/03/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
05/01/1984HousePassed House by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/1984HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/1984HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/05/1984HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
02/29/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
02/27/1984SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/23/1984SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 671.
02/23/1984SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/23/1984SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/09/1984SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/09/1984 Referred to
02/23/1984 Markup by
02/23/1984 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service02/29/1984 Referred to
05/01/1984 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/05/1984 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.232. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/09/1984)

Authorizes and requests the President to designate the month of May 1984 as National Physical Fitness and Sports Month.