Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

A joint resolution to designate the week of October 7, 1984, through October 13, 1984, as "Smokey Bear Week".

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the week of May 13, 1984, through May 19, 1984, as "Smokey Bear Week".


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/11/1984Became Public Law No: 98-467.
10/11/1984Signed by President.
10/10/1984Presented to President.
10/04/1984Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/02/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/02/1984House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/08/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
05/03/1984Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
04/12/1984Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/11/1984Became Public Law No: 98-467.
10/11/1984Signed by President.
10/10/1984SenatePresented to President.
10/10/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/04/1984SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
10/02/1984HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/02/1984HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
10/02/1984HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/09/1984HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
05/08/1984SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
05/08/1984SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
05/08/1984SenateS.Amdt.3051 Amendment SP 3051 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
05/08/1984SenateS.Amdt.3051 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Heflin. To change the date of "Smokey Bear Week".
05/03/1984SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 838.
05/03/1984SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/03/1984SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/12/1984SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Baker, Howard H., Jr. [R-TN]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/26/1984
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 04/26/1984
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 04/26/1984
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/02/1984
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/03/1984
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/03/1984
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/03/1984
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 05/03/1984
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 05/03/1984
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/03/1984
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 05/03/1984
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/03/1984
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/03/1984
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/17/1984
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 05/17/1984
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 05/17/1984
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/17/1984
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 05/17/1984
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/17/1984
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/17/1984

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/12/1984 Referred to
05/03/1984 Markup by
05/03/1984 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service05/09/1984 Referred to
10/02/1984 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.J.Res.273. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/02/1984)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Designates the week of October 7 through October 13, 1984, as Smokey Bear Week.