Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to amend the Constitution to establish legislative authority in Congress and the States with respect to abortion.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/28/1983Failed of passage/not agreed to in Senate: Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49-50. Record Vote No: 173.
06/07/1983Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without recommendation with an amendment. With written report No. 98-149.
01/26/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
06/28/1983Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49-50. Record Vote No: 173.
Action By: Senate
06/28/1983Considered by Senate.
Action By: Senate
06/27/1983Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
Action By: Senate
06/07/1983Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 235.
Action By: Senate
06/07/1983Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without recommendation with an amendment. With written report No. 98-149.
04/19/1983Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment without recommendation.
03/24/1983Subcommittee on Constitution. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
03/07/1983Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-381.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
02/28/1983Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
02/22/1983Referred to Subcommittee on Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/26/1983Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (11)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/26/1983
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 01/26/1983
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL]* 01/26/1983
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 01/26/1983
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 01/26/1983
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 01/26/1983
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/03/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/02/1983
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 05/16/1983
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/22/1983
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/27/1983
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA] 05/02/1983 05/03/1983 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary01/26/1983 Referred to
04/19/1983 Markup by
06/07/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-149
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution02/22/1983 Referred to
03/07/1983 Hearings by
03/24/1983 Markup by
03/24/1983 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.3.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.3. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (06/07/1983)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. rept. 98-149)

Constitutional Amendment - Declares that a right to abortion is not secured by the Constitution.