Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to grant posthumously full rights of citizenship to William Penn and to Hannah Callowhill Penn.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/19/1984Became Public Law No: 98-516.
10/19/1984Signed by President.
10/10/1984Presented to President.
10/04/1984Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
10/04/1984House Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/1983Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
11/17/1983Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
04/12/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/19/1984Became Public Law No: 98-516.
10/19/1984Signed by President.
10/10/1984SenatePresented to President.
10/10/1984SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/04/1984HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/04/1984HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/1984HouseHouse Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/01/1983HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/18/1983SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
11/18/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
11/17/1983SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591.
11/17/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
11/17/1983SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/12/1983SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/12/1983 Referred to
11/17/1983 Markup by
11/17/1983 Reported by
House Judiciary11/18/1983 Referred to
10/04/1984 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law12/01/1983 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.80. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/12/1983)

Requests the President to grant posthumous citizenship to William Penn, founder of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and his wife, Hannah Callowhill Penn.