Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating a day of remembrance for victims of genocide.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/05/1984Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. Without written report.
04/21/1983Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/05/1984Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 744.
Action By: Senate
04/05/1984Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. Without written report.
04/05/1984Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/21/1983Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]* 01/26/1984
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/28/1984
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/28/1984
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/28/1984
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/28/1984
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/28/1984
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/28/1984
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/28/1984
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 02/28/1984
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/28/1984
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 03/22/1984
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 03/22/1984
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/22/1984
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/22/1984
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/22/1984
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/22/1984
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/22/1984
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/22/1984
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/22/1984
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/22/1984
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/22/1984
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/22/1984
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/22/1984
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 03/22/1984
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/29/1984
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/29/1984
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/29/1984
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/29/1984
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 03/29/1984
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/29/1984
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 03/29/1984
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/10/1984
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/10/1984
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/10/1984
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 04/10/1984
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 05/01/1984
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 05/01/1984

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary04/21/1983 Referred to
04/05/1984 Markup by
04/05/1984 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.87.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.87. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/21/1983)

Designates April 24, 1984, as a day of remembrance for all victims of genocide, especially those of Armenian ancestry who died between 1915 and 1923.