Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original resolution to amend S. Res. 76 of the 98th Congress.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
03/02/1984Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
02/23/1984Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 98-358.
01/25/1984Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Hatch. Without written report.
01/25/1984Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
03/02/1984Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
03/02/1984Considered by Senate.
02/23/1984Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 679.
02/23/1984Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 98-358.
02/22/1984Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
02/08/1984Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
01/25/1984Referred to the Committee on Rules.
01/25/1984Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Hatch. Without written report.
01/24/1984Committee on Labor and Human Resources ordered to be reported an original measure.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration01/25/1984 Referred to
02/08/1984 Hearings by
02/22/1984 Markup by
02/23/1984 Reported by S.Rept 98-358
Senate Labor and Human Resources01/24/1984 Markup by
01/25/1984 Reported original measure

No related bill information was received for S.Res.309.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.309. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/02/1984)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Amends the Omnibus Committee Funding Resolution of 1983 to increase the authorized expenditures of the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.