Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/03/1983
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/03/1983
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/03/1983
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/15/1983
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/15/1983
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 02/15/1983
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/15/1983
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/15/1983
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/15/1983
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/15/1983
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 02/15/1983
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/15/1983
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/23/1983
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/23/1983
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA] 02/23/1983
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/23/1983
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA] 02/23/1983
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 02/23/1983
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/23/1983
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/01/1983
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/01/1983
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 03/01/1983
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/01/1983
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/08/1983
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/08/1983
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 03/09/1983