Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 01/03/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/24/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 01/24/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 01/24/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 01/24/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 01/24/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 01/24/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/24/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 01/24/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 01/24/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 01/24/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/24/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/24/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/24/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 01/24/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/24/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 01/24/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/24/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 01/24/1985
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 01/24/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 01/24/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 01/24/1985
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 01/24/1985
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/24/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/24/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/24/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/24/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 01/31/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 01/31/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 01/31/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/31/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 01/31/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/31/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 01/31/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 01/31/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/31/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 01/31/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/31/1985
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 01/31/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/31/1985
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 01/31/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 01/31/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/31/1985
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 01/31/1985
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 01/31/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 01/31/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 01/31/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 01/31/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 01/31/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/31/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 01/31/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 02/06/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/06/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/06/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 02/06/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/06/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 02/06/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 02/06/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 02/06/1985
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 02/26/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 02/26/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/26/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/26/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 02/26/1985