Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nuclear Powerplant Standardization Act of 1985

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 to encourage the development and use of standardized plant designs and improve the nuclear licensing and regulatory process.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/22/1986Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
06/26/1986Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
05/01/1986Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power
12/10/1985Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power
07/25/1985Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power
02/26/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/12/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/07/1985Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1985Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1985Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 02/07/1985
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/05/1985
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 03/05/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/19/1985
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 03/19/1985
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 03/19/1985
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 03/19/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 03/19/1985
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/19/1985
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 03/19/1985
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 04/16/1985
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/16/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/16/1985
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 04/16/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/16/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/16/1985
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/16/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/08/1985
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 05/08/1985
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 05/08/1985
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 05/08/1985
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/08/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/10/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 06/10/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 06/10/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/10/1985
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 06/10/1985
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 06/10/1985
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 06/10/1985
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 06/10/1985
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/10/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 06/10/1985
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/10/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 06/10/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/10/1985
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 06/10/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/11/1985
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/11/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/11/1985
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 08/01/1985
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 12/03/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/15/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/1986

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/07/1985 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power02/26/1985 Referred to
05/01/1986 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/07/1985 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment02/12/1985 Referred to
07/22/1986 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1029.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1029. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/1985)

Nuclear Powerplant Standardization Act of 1985 - Title I: Licensing and Regulatory Process - Amends the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 to require the Nuclear Regulatory Commission to establish procedures, standards, and criteria permitting the approval of standardized ten-year facility designs. Declares that a design approval shall be considered to be a license for the purpose of such Act. Requires the Commission to establish procedures for an additional ten-year renewal of such a design approval.

Requires the Commission to establish procedures, standards, and criteria permitting the approval of a site or sites for one or more utilization or production facilities for industrial or commercial purposes for a period of ten years. Authorizes the Commission, after a determination that a proposed site is suitable, to issue a permit which shall be considered to be a license. Requires the Commission to establish procedures for a ten-year renewal of site permits.

Requires that before issuance of construction and operating licenses: (1) an opportunity be provided for public hearings; and (2) the applicant establish competency to construct and operate the facility in conformity with the application.

Requires the holder of a license to notify the Commission of the proposed date of initial operation at least nine months before commencement.

Directs the Commission to adopt regulations establishing criteria to govern all modifications of Commission regulatory requirements.

Declares that the Commission, in making any determination under this Act, need not consider or reconsider any issue that has been resolved in any other proceeding under this Act, in the absence of significant new information substantially affecting the conclusions reached in the other proceeding.

Title II: Technical and Conforming Amendments - Amends the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 to conform to the provisions of this Act.