Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 02/19/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/07/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/07/1985
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/07/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 03/07/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/07/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 03/07/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/07/1985
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/07/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/07/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 03/07/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 03/07/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/07/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/07/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/07/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/07/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/07/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/07/1985
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/07/1985
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/18/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/18/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/18/1985
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/18/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/18/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/02/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/02/1985
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 05/02/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/02/1985
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 05/22/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/22/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/22/1985
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/22/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 08/01/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/01/1986