Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/21/1985
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/07/1985
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 03/07/1985
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 03/07/1985
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 03/07/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/07/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/07/1985
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/07/1985
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 03/07/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/02/1985
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/24/1985
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/30/1985
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 04/30/1985
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 05/16/1985