Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Colorado River Floodway Protection Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Colorado River Floodway Protection Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Colorado River Floodway Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Colorado River Floodway Protection Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Colorado River Floodway Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish a federally declared floodway for the Colorado River below Davis Dam.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/08/1986Became Public Law No: 99-450.
10/08/1986Signed by President.
10/01/1986Presented to President.
09/23/1986Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/15/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 1696 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/15/1986Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/24/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/10/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-261.
02/25/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/08/1986Became Public Law No: 99-450.
10/08/1986Signed by President.
10/01/1986HousePresented to President.
10/01/1986SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/23/1986HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/15/1986SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 1696 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/15/1986SenateSenate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 1696 amended.
09/15/1986SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/26/1986SenateOrdered, that when S.1696 or, the companion measure, H.R. 1246 is reported, it then be sequentially referred to the Energy Committee for a period not to exceed 15 calendar days.
09/26/1985SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/24/1985HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/24/1985HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
09/10/1985HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 162.
09/10/1985HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-261.
07/31/1985HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/31/1985HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/31/1985HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Resources Discharged.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources
05/09/1985HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources
03/21/1985HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/25/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
02/25/1985HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/25/1985 Referred to
07/31/1985 Markup by
09/10/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-261
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources03/21/1985 Referred to
05/09/1985 Hearings by
07/31/1985 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works09/26/1985 Referred to
09/15/1986 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1246. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/15/1986)

(Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 1696)

Colorado River Floodway Protection Act - Establishes the Colorado River Floodway Task Force to prepare recommendations concerning the management of land within the Colorado River Floodway, including the potential application of the Floodway on Indian lands. Establishes the Colorado River Floodway, with boundaries to be determined by floodflow levels downstream of Davis Dam.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to file with the appropriate congressional committees maps of the Floodway, and to provide each State, local, or Federal agency affected by such floodway system with copies of such maps. Permits the Secretary to make minor modifications to such maps after timely notice to the State or agency involved. Directs the Secretary to review the Floodway at least once every five years and to make all necessary changes.

Denies the availability of new expenditures or new financial assistance for any purpose within the Floodway, with specified exceptions. Allows the appropriate Federal officer to make Federal expenditures or financial assistance available within the Floodway, for: (1) any dam, channel, levee, or other structure whose purpose is flood control, water conservation, power, or water quality, drainage facility, or other remedial or corrective measure; (2) the maintenance and expansion of publicly or tribally operated roads, structures, or facilities, with specified exceptions; and (3) certain other activities whose purposes are consistent with this Act, such as fish and wildlife enhancement projects, air and water navigation aids, scientific research, emergency assistance, and riverbank stabilization projects.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior to make written certification each year after FY 1985 that each Federal agency concerned has complied with the provisions of this Act.

Requires the Secretary, within one year of enactment of this Act, to submit a report on the Floodway to the appropriate congressional committees, detailing the work of the task force and any recommendations the Secretary may have. Directs the Secretary, in making such report, to analyze the effects of this Act on the economic development of the Indian tribes whose lands are located within the Floodway.

Amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to limit new flood insurance coverage on new construction or substantial improvements to structures within the Floodway to a date six months after the enactment of this Act.

Denies the granting of Federal leases on land located within the Floodway unless the Secretary determines that the proposed use of such land will be consistent with the purposes of this Act. Exempts from such prohibition certain lease operations on Indian lands. Requires pre-Act Federal land lessees to take reasonable steps to minimize any land use inconsistent with the purposes of this Act. Prohibits the granting of leases between Hoover Dam and Davis Dam unless the Secretary determines that the lease would be consistent with the operation of Lake Mohave.

Authorizes appropriations through FY 1990.