Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to grant the consent of the Congress to the Southeast Interstate Low-Level Radioactive Waste Management Compact.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 99-317 (Part II).
10/22/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-317 (Part I).
02/26/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date All Actions
12/09/1985House Incorporated this Measure (Amended) in H.R.3878 as an Amendment.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/05/1985Placed on Union Calendar No: 247.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/05/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 99-317 (Part II).
10/29/1985Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/29/1985Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/22/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-317 (Part I).
10/03/1985Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power
10/03/1985Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power
07/31/1985Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/31/1985Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/18/1985Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power
06/27/1985Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
06/27/1985Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
06/18/1985Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
06/13/1985Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
06/12/1985Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power
03/08/1985Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
03/07/1985Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
03/07/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
03/05/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/26/1985Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/1985Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/1985Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]* 02/26/1985
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/06/1985
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 03/06/1985
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 03/06/1985
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 03/19/1985
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/19/1985
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/19/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/19/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 03/19/1985
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 04/04/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/04/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 04/04/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/29/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/29/1985
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 04/29/1985
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/29/1985
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 04/29/1985
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 04/29/1985
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/29/1985
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/13/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/13/1985
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 05/13/1985
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 05/13/1985
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 05/13/1985
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/13/1985
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/13/1985
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 06/06/1985
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 06/06/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 06/06/1985
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 06/06/1985
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 06/19/1985

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/26/1985 Referred to
10/29/1985 Markup by
12/05/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-317 Part 2
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power03/05/1985 Referred to
07/18/1985 Hearings by
10/03/1985 Markup by
10/03/1985 Reported by
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/26/1985 Referred to
07/31/1985 Markup by
10/22/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-317 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment03/07/1985 Referred to
03/08/1985 Hearings by
06/27/1985 Markup by
06/27/1985 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1267. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part II (12/05/1985)

(Reported to House from the Committee on Energy and Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 99-317 (Part II))

Interstate Compact - Grants congressional approval to the Southeast Interstate Compact on Low-Level Radioactive Waste Management, which provides for cooperation among the States of Alabama, Florida, Georgia, Mississippi, North Carolina, South Carolina, Tennessee, and Virginia in the management of low-level radioactive waste on a continuing basis.

Conditions congressional consent to such Compact upon whichever of the following occurs later: (1) the date of enactment of this Act; or (2) the date of enactment of legislation providing for limited disposal capacity availability in low-level radioactive waste disposal facilities in operation on January 1, 1985, for low-level radioactive waste generated by any source and for a specified period beginning after December 31, 1985.

Grants congressional consent to such Compact subject to the provisions of the Low-Level Radioactive Waste Policy Act, as amended, and only for so long as the regional body established in the Compact is in compliance with such Act.