Committees: H.R.1267 — 99th Congress (1985-1986)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/26/1985 Referred to
10/29/1985 Markup by
12/05/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-317 Part 2
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power03/05/1985 Referred to
07/18/1985 Hearings by
10/03/1985 Markup by
10/03/1985 Reported by
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/26/1985 Referred to
07/31/1985 Markup by
10/22/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-317 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment03/07/1985 Referred to
03/08/1985 Hearings by
06/27/1985 Markup by
06/27/1985 Reported by