Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 02/26/1985
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 03/19/1985
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 05/22/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/22/1985
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/22/1985
Rep. Grotberg, John E. [R-IL-14] 05/22/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/22/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/22/1985
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/22/1985
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 05/22/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/22/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/22/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 05/22/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/22/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/22/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/04/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 06/04/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/04/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/04/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/04/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/04/1985
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/04/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/04/1985
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 06/04/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/04/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/04/1985
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/04/1985
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/04/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/04/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/05/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/05/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/05/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/05/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/05/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/05/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/05/1985
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 06/05/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/05/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/11/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/11/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/11/1985
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/11/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/11/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/11/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/11/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/11/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/11/1985
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/11/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/26/1985
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 06/26/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/26/1985
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 06/26/1985
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 06/26/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/26/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/26/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/26/1985
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/26/1985
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 06/26/1985
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/26/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/26/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 06/26/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/26/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/26/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/26/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/26/1985
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/26/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/26/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/26/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/26/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/26/1985
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/26/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/26/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/09/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/09/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/09/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/09/1985
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 07/16/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/16/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/16/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/16/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 07/16/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/24/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/24/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/24/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 09/18/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/18/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 11/06/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 12/19/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/26/1986