Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 02/27/1985
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/20/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/20/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/20/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/20/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 03/20/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/20/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/20/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/20/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/20/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/20/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/20/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 03/20/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/20/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/03/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/03/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/03/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/03/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 04/03/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/03/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/03/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/03/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/03/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/03/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/03/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/03/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/23/1985
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 04/23/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 04/23/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/23/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/23/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 04/23/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/23/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/21/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 06/11/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 06/11/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/31/1985
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/31/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/31/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/24/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 10/24/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 11/21/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/21/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/21/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 12/10/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 12/10/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 12/10/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 01/22/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/22/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/22/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 02/19/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 03/05/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/1986
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/05/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/05/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 03/05/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 03/20/1986
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/20/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/20/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/22/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/22/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/22/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/22/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/22/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/08/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/08/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/08/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/08/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/08/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/08/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/08/1986
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/08/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/08/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 05/13/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 05/13/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/13/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/13/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/13/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/13/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/13/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/13/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/13/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/13/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 05/13/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/14/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/14/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/14/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/14/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/14/1986
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 05/21/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/21/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/21/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/21/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/21/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/21/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/21/1986
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/21/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/04/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/04/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/04/1986
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 06/04/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 06/12/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/12/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/12/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/12/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/12/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/18/1986
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/18/1986
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/18/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 06/18/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/18/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/18/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/18/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/18/1986
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 06/18/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 06/18/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/25/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 06/25/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/25/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/25/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/25/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/25/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/25/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/25/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/15/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/15/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/15/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/16/1986
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 07/16/1986
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/16/1986