Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for the restoration of Federal recognition to the Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and the Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
09/24/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/23/1986Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Andrews with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 99-470.
12/16/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
12/16/1985Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-440.
02/28/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
09/25/1986SenateReturned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 998.
09/25/1986SenateSenate vitiated previous passage.
09/24/1986SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/23/1986SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 960.
09/23/1986SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Andrews with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 99-470.
Action By: Permanent Select Committee on Indian Affairs
09/15/1986SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Permanent Select Committee on Indian Affairs
06/25/1986SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-771.
Action By: Permanent Select Committee on Indian Affairs
12/16/1985SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
12/16/1985HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
12/16/1985HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
12/16/1985HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 264.
12/16/1985HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-440.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
12/04/1985HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
12/04/1985HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
10/17/1985HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
09/27/1985HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/28/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
02/28/1985HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/28/1985

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/28/1985 Referred to
10/17/1985 Hearings by
12/04/1985 Markup by
12/16/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-440
Senate Indian Affairs12/16/1985 Referred to
06/25/1986 Hearings by
09/15/1986 Markup by
09/23/1986 Reported by S.Rept 99-470

No related bill information was received for H.R.1344.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1344. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/24/1986)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act - Title I: Ysleta del Sur Pueblo Restoration - Redesignates the Tiwa Indians of Ysleta, Texas, as the Ysleta del Sur Pueblo. Restores Federal recognition, rights, and benefits to such tribe. Provides that nothing in this Act shall affect the power of the State of Texas to enact special legislation to benefit the tribe. Authorizes Texas to perform services that benefit the tribe.

Recognizes the authority of the Tribal Council. Declares their reservation to be a Federal Indian reservation. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to accept and hold in trust tribal lands conveyed by the tribe and Texas.

Grants Texas civil and criminal jurisdiction within such reservation.

Requires the Secretary to develop a plan for the enlargement of the reservation for the tribe. Requires the Secretary to submit such plan to the Congress. Sets forth specified requirements with respect to the development of such plan.

Repeals the Tiwa Indians Act.

Prohibits gaming, gambling, lottery, or bingo, as defined by Texas law, on the tribe's reservation and on tribal lands. Sets forth both civil and criminal penalties for violations of such prohibition. Prohibits construing such prohibition as a grant of civil regulatory jurisdiction to Texas.

Sets forth specified requirements with respect to the tribe's membership.

Title II: Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas - States that the Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas shall be considered as one tribal unit for purposes of Federal law. Restores Federal recognition, rights, and benefits to such tribe. Authorizes Texas to perform services that benefit the tribe.

Provides that nothing in this Act shall affect the power of the State of Texas to enact special legislation to benefit the tribe.

Retains the existing tribal constitution and bylaws. Requires the Secretary, upon the request of the Tribal Council, to hold an election for the members of the tribe for the purpose of adopting a new constitution and bylaws. Recognizes the authority of the Tribal Council.

Sets forth provisions similar to title I regarding civil and criminal jurisdiction, the tribal reservation, gaming laws, and State civil regulatory jurisdiction.