Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend part B of title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide a voluntary insurance option for medicare beneficiaries permitting coverage of certain gaps in medicare coverage and covering one preventive care visit each year.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
03/12/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/07/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/1985Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/1985Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/1985Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/02/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/18/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/18/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 04/18/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/18/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/13/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/19/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/10/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/10/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/05/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/05/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/11/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/11/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/11/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/11/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/11/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 06/12/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/12/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/12/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/17/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/17/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/17/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 06/19/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/19/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/19/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/24/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/24/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/26/1986
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 06/26/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 07/16/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/16/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/22/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/24/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 08/06/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/06/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 08/08/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/15/1986
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 04/02/1985 04/03/1985 --
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/13/1985 06/04/1985 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/05/1985 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment03/07/1985 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/05/1985 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/12/1985 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1402.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1402. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/1985)

Amends part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to permit each individual enrolled under part B to elect to be provided the benefits described in this Act. Provides that each such individual shall be deemed to have elected coverage for such benefits, unless the individual files notice to the contrary. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish the premiums for such coverage. Sets forth the following benefits to be provided by such coverage: (1) the limitation on the length of inpatient hospital services under part A (Hospital Insurance) of title XVIII would be dropped; (2) coinsurance payments, under part A, for the first 100 days of skilled nursing coverage would be dropped; (3) coinsurance payments for part B services would be dropped; and (4) coverage for an annual preventive health care visit.