Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 03/07/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 03/07/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/21/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/21/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/21/1985
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/21/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 03/21/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/21/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/21/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/21/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/21/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/21/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/21/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/26/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/26/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/26/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 03/26/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/26/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/26/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/26/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/02/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/02/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/02/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/02/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 04/02/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/02/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/02/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/02/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/24/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/24/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/24/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/24/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/24/1985
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 04/24/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/24/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/24/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/24/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/24/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 04/24/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/24/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/24/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/24/1985
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 04/25/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/25/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/25/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/25/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 04/25/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/25/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 04/25/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/25/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/25/1985
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/29/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 04/29/1985
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 05/02/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/02/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/02/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/02/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/02/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/02/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/02/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/02/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/07/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/07/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 05/07/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 05/07/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/20/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/20/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/20/1985
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/20/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/20/1985
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 05/20/1985
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 05/20/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/20/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/20/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/20/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 05/20/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/04/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/04/1985
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 06/04/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/04/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/04/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/04/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/04/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/04/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/04/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/18/1985
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 06/18/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/18/1985
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/18/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 06/18/1985
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/18/1985
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 06/18/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/18/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/18/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/18/1985
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 06/18/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/18/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/18/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/18/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/18/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 06/18/1985
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/18/1985
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/18/1985
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/24/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/24/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/24/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 06/24/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/24/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/24/1985
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/24/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/24/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/27/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/27/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/27/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 06/27/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/27/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/27/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 07/09/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/09/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/09/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 07/11/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/11/1985
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/11/1985
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/11/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/11/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/17/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/17/1985
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 07/17/1985
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/17/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 07/17/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/23/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/23/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/04/1985
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/04/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/04/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/04/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 09/04/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/04/1985
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 09/04/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 09/04/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 09/26/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 09/26/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/26/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/26/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 11/06/1985
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 12/04/1985