Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 03/19/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/01/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/01/1985
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/01/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/01/1985
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/01/1985
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 04/01/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/01/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/01/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/01/1985
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 04/01/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/01/1985
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/01/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/01/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/01/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 04/01/1985
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 04/01/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/01/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 04/01/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/01/1985
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 04/01/1985
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/17/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/17/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/17/1985
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/17/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/17/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/17/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/17/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/17/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/17/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/17/1985
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/17/1985
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/17/1985
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 04/17/1985
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 04/29/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/29/1985
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/29/1985
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/29/1985
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/29/1985
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/29/1985
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/29/1985
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30] 04/29/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/29/1985
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/07/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/07/1985
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/07/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/1985
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/24/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/24/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/24/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/24/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/24/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/24/1985
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 06/24/1985
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/24/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/12/1985

Show cosponsors who withdrew